Senate | 04/29/2019 | File Number 843 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 444 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/22/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/18/2019 | Public Hearing 03/22 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |