Senate | 06/21/2019 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/17/2019 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/17/2019 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/12/2019 | Public Act 19-41 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2019 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/04/2019 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 06/04/2019 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/22/2019 | House Calendar Number 652 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/21/2019 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | File Number 802 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 394 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/18/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/29/2019 | Public Hearing 04/03 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |