Senate | 04/18/2019 | File Number 765 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 367 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/18/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/12/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/02/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/01/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Public Hearing 03/25 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |