Senate
|
06/28/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2019
|
Public Act 19-80
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
House Calendar Number 700
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10229
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2019
|
File Number 766
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 369
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2019
|
Public Hearing 04/03
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|