House | 07/01/2019 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/24/2019 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/24/2019 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/19/2019 | Public Act 19-93 | ||
House | 06/04/2019 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/04/2019 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 06/04/2019 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 06/04/2019 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2019 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 06/04/2019 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10699 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | File Number 807 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 399 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/18/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/29/2019 | Public Hearing 04/03 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |