House | 06/18/2019 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/06/2019 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/06/2019 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/05/2019 | Public Act 19-23 | ||
House | 05/30/2019 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/30/2019 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/30/2019 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/30/2019 | Rules Suspended | ||
House | 05/30/2019 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House | ||
Senate | 05/30/2019 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/30/2019 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10226 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2019 | File Number 767 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 370 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/18/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/12/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/29/2019 | Public Hearing 04/03 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |