Senate | 05/20/2019 | File Number 919 | ||
Senate | 05/20/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 548 | ||
Senate | 05/20/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/20/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/20/19 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 05/03/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/02/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 04/01/2019 | Public Hearing 04/05 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |