Senate | 06/21/2019 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2019 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2019 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/05/2019 | Public Act 19-15 | ||
Senate | 06/01/2019 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/01/2019 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 06/01/2019 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 06/01/2019 | House Calendar Number 704 | ||
Senate | 06/01/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 06/01/2019 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/30/2019 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2019 | File Number 946 | ||
Senate | 05/21/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 560 | ||
Senate | 05/21/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/21/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/20/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Public Hearing 04/29 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |