Senate | 05/20/2019 | File Number 928 | ||
Senate | 05/20/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 557 | ||
Senate | 05/20/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/20/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/20/19 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 05/02/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/01/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Public Hearing 04/29 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |