Senate | 06/05/2019 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/05/2019 | Adopted, House | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | House Calendar Number 558 | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/08/2019 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2019 | Adopted, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | File Number 238 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 132 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/22/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/13/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/12/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/27/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/26/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/19/2019 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/08/2019 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
Senate | 01/24/2019 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |