Senate | 03/27/2019 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | Adopted, House | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | House Calendar Number 50 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 03/13/2019 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2019 | Adopted, Senate | ||
Senate | 02/27/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 27 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | Public Hearing 02/25 | ||
Senate | 02/14/2019 | Nomination Referred to Committee on Judiciary |