Senate | 05/23/2019 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/23/2019 | Adopted, House | ||
Senate | 05/23/2019 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 05/22/2019 | House Calendar Number 640 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/21/2019 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2019 | Adopted, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 519 | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | Public Hearing 05/16 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations |