Senate | 06/05/2019 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/05/2019 | Adopted, House | ||
Senate | 05/30/2019 | House Calendar Number 671 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/28/2019 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/28/2019 | Adopted, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/22/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 588 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/21/2019 | Public Hearing 05/21 | ||
Senate | 05/06/2019 | Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations |