Senate | 03/27/2019 | Adopted, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2019 | File Number 111 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 77 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/18/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2019 | Senate Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/13/2019 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/04/2019 | Filed with Senate Clerks |