Senate | 04/17/2019 | Adopted, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | File Number 665 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 323 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/02/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/01/2019 | Senate Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/26/2019 | Public Hearing 04/01 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/18/2019 | Filed with Senate Clerks |