Senate | 05/31/2019 | Adopted, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/22/2019 | File Number 955 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 562 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/22/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/20/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/28/19 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 05/17/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/17/2019 | Senate Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Public Hearing 05/17 | ||
Senate | 05/07/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/03/2019 | Filed with Senate Clerks |