Senate | 05/31/2019 | Adopted, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/28/2019 | File Number 1012 | ||
Senate | 05/28/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 630 | ||
Senate | 05/28/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/28/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/28/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 06/03/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 05/28/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/28/2019 | Senate Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/24/2019 | Public Hearing 05/28 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/18/2019 | Filed with Senate Clerks |