House | 03/10/2020 | File Number 4 | ||
House | 03/10/2020 | House Calendar Number 35 | ||
House | 03/10/2020 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/10/2020 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/03/2020 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/09/20 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/25/2020 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/24/2020 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/13/2020 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
House | 02/10/2020 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |