1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | LCO No. 1626 1 of 3 |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | General Assembly Raised Bill No. 5232 |
---|
6 | 6 | | February Session, 2020 |
---|
7 | 7 | | LCO No. 1626 |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | Referred to Committee on HUMAN SERVICES |
---|
11 | 11 | | |
---|
12 | 12 | | |
---|
13 | 13 | | Introduced by: |
---|
14 | 14 | | (HS) |
---|
15 | 15 | | |
---|
16 | 16 | | |
---|
17 | 17 | | |
---|
18 | 18 | | |
---|
19 | 19 | | AN ACT CONCERNING A MINIMUM BASE RATE FO R METHADONE |
---|
20 | 20 | | MAINTENANCE TREATMEN T. |
---|
21 | 21 | | Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General |
---|
22 | 22 | | Assembly convened: |
---|
23 | 23 | | |
---|
24 | 24 | | Section 1. Section 17b-280c of the 2020 supplement to the general 1 |
---|
25 | 25 | | statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof 2 |
---|
26 | 26 | | (Effective July 1, 2020): 3 |
---|
27 | 27 | | (a) For purposes of this section: (1) "Methadone maintenance" means 4 |
---|
28 | 28 | | a chemical maintenance program under which an addiction to one drug, 5 |
---|
29 | 29 | | including, but not limited to, heroin, is treated with the drug methadone 6 |
---|
30 | 30 | | in a weekly program that includes on and off-site methadone 7 |
---|
31 | 31 | | administration, drug testing and counseling; and (2) "chemical 8 |
---|
32 | 32 | | maintenance provider" means a provider certified and licensed by the 9 |
---|
33 | 33 | | federal Substance Abuse and Mental Health Services Administration 10 |
---|
34 | 34 | | and the state Department of Public Health who meets all federal and 11 |
---|
35 | 35 | | state requirements, including, but not limited to, requirements specific 12 |
---|
36 | 36 | | to the provision of chemical maintenance services. 13 |
---|
37 | 37 | | (b) The Commissioner of Social Services shall amend the Medicaid 14 |
---|
38 | 38 | | state plan to provide a minimum weekly reimbursement rate of eighty-15 Raised Bill No. 5232 |
---|
39 | 39 | | |
---|
40 | 40 | | |
---|
41 | 41 | | |
---|
42 | 42 | | LCO No. 1626 2 of 3 |
---|
43 | 43 | | |
---|
44 | 44 | | eight dollars and fifty-two cents to a chemical maintenance provider for 16 |
---|
45 | 45 | | methadone maintenance treatment of a Medicaid beneficiary, provided 17 |
---|
46 | 46 | | no such provider receiving a higher rate shall have such rate reduced to 18 |
---|
47 | 47 | | the minimum as a result of the implementation of a new minimum 19 |
---|
48 | 48 | | reimbursement rate. 20 |
---|
49 | 49 | | [(c) Notwithstanding subsection (b) of this section, on or after July 1, 21 |
---|
50 | 50 | | 2020, any reimbursement to a chemical maintenance provider for 22 |
---|
51 | 51 | | methadone maintenance treatment shall be contingent upon meeting 23 |
---|
52 | 52 | | certain performance measures as determined by the commissioner. Such 24 |
---|
53 | 53 | | performance measures shall be developed in consultation with the 25 |
---|
54 | 54 | | Department of Mental Health and Addiction Services and chemical 26 |
---|
55 | 55 | | maintenance providers. Initial performance measures shall be 27 |
---|
56 | 56 | | developed by September 30, 2019, including the means by which such 28 |
---|
57 | 57 | | measures shall be evaluated. The initial evaluation period shall be based 29 |
---|
58 | 58 | | on the claims data for the quarter ending March 31, 2020. The 30 |
---|
59 | 59 | | performance measures and thresholds may be adjusted after the initial 31 |
---|
60 | 60 | | evaluation period. Failure to meet department-identified standards on 32 |
---|
61 | 61 | | performance measures shall result in a rate reduction of (1) up to five 33 |
---|
62 | 62 | | per cent for the quarters ending September 30, 2020, and December 31, 34 |
---|
63 | 63 | | 2020, and (2) up to ten per cent beginning January 1, 2021. No provider 35 |
---|
64 | 64 | | shall receive a rate decrease under this subsection that is more than a ten 36 |
---|
65 | 65 | | per cent decrease annually.] 37 |
---|
66 | 66 | | [(d)] (c) The Commissioner of Social Services, pursuant to section 17b-38 |
---|
67 | 67 | | 10, may implement policies and procedures to administer the provisions 39 |
---|
68 | 68 | | of this section while in the process of adopting such policies and 40 |
---|
69 | 69 | | procedures in regulation form, provided the commissioner [prints] 41 |
---|
70 | 70 | | posts notice of the intent to adopt the regulations on the department's 42 |
---|
71 | 71 | | Internet web site and the eRegulations System not later than twenty 43 |
---|
72 | 72 | | days after the date of implementation. Such policies and procedures 44 |
---|
73 | 73 | | shall be valid until the time final regulations are adopted. 45 |
---|
74 | 74 | | This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following |
---|
75 | 75 | | sections: |
---|
76 | 76 | | |
---|
77 | 77 | | Section 1 July 1, 2020 17b-280c Raised Bill No. 5232 |
---|
78 | 78 | | |
---|
79 | 79 | | |
---|
80 | 80 | | |
---|
81 | 81 | | LCO No. 1626 3 of 3 |
---|
82 | 82 | | |
---|
83 | 83 | | |
---|
84 | 84 | | Statement of Purpose: |
---|
85 | 85 | | To eliminate requirements that payment rates be tied to performance |
---|
86 | 86 | | measures. |
---|
87 | 87 | | [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except |
---|
88 | 88 | | that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not |
---|
89 | 89 | | underlined.] |
---|
90 | 90 | | |
---|