Senate | 08/12/2020 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 08/07/2020 | Public Act 20-1 | ||
Senate | 07/31/2020 | Signed by Governor in Original | ||
Senate | 07/28/2020 | Immediate Transmittal to the Governor | ||
Senate | 07/28/2020 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 07/28/2020 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 07/23/2020 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 07/23/2020 | House Passed | ||
House | 07/23/2020 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 3808 | ||
House | 07/23/2020 | Emergency Certification |