Senate | 10/16/2020 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 10/08/2020 | Public Act 20-8 | ||
Senate | 10/02/2020 | Signed by Governor in Original | ||
Senate | 10/01/2020 | Immediate Transmittal to the Governor | ||
Senate | 10/01/2020 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 10/01/2020 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 09/30/2020 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 09/30/2020 | House Passed | ||
House | 09/30/2020 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 4472 | ||
House | 09/30/2020 | Emergency Certification |