Connecticut 2020 2020 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00290 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/26/2020

                        
 
LCO No. 1741  	1 of 4 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 290  
February Session, 2020  
LCO No. 1741 
 
 
Referred to Committee on ENERGY AND TECHNOLOGY  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(ET)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING TA XATION OF CERTAIN SOLAR POWER 
FACILITIES. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Subdivision (57) of section 12-81 of the 2020 supplement to 1 
the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu 2 
thereof (Effective from passage and applicable to assessment years commencing 3 
on and after October 1, 2020): 4 
(57) (A) (i) Any Class I renewable energy source, as defined in section 5 
16-1, or hydropower facility described in subdivision (21) of subsection 6 
(a) of section 16-1, installed for the generation of electricity for private 7 
residential use or on a farm, as defined in subsection (q) of section 1-1, 8 
provided such installation occurs on or after October 1, 2007, and further 9 
provided such installation is for a single family dwelling, a multifamily 10 
dwelling consisting of two to four units or a farm, (ii) any passive or 11 
active solar water or space heating system, or (iii) any geothermal 12 
energy resource. In the case of clause (ii) or (iii) of this subparagraph, 13 
such exemption shall apply only to the amount by which the assessed 14 
valuation of the real property equipped with such system or resource 15  Raised Bill No.  290 
 
 
 
LCO No. 1741   	2 of 4 
 
exceeds the assessed valuation of such real property equipped with the 16 
conventional portion of the system or resource; 17 
(B) For assessment years commencing on and after October 1, 2013, 18 
any Class I renewable energy source, as defined in section 16-1, 19 
hydropower facility described in subdivision (21) of subsection (a) of 20 
section 16-1, or solar thermal or geothermal renewable energy source, 21 
installed for generation or displacement of energy, provided (i) such 22 
installation occurs on or after January 1, 2010, (ii) such installation is for 23 
commercial or industrial purposes, (iii) the nameplate capacity of such 24 
source or facility does not exceed the load for the location where such 25 
generation or displacement is located, and (iv) such source or facility is 26 
located in a distressed municipality, as defined in section 32-9p, with a 27 
population between one hundred twenty-five thousand and one 28 
hundred thirty-five thousand; 29 
(C) For assessment years commencing on and after October 1, 2013, 30 
any municipality may, upon approval by its legislative body or in any 31 
town in which the legislative body is a town meeting, by the board of 32 
selectmen, abate up to one hundred per cent of property tax for any 33 
Class I renewable energy source, as defined in section 16-1, hydropower 34 
facility described in subdivision (21) of subsection (a) of section 16-1, or 35 
solar thermal or geothermal renewable energy source, installed for 36 
generation or displacement of energy, provided (i) such installation 37 
occurs between January 1, 2010, and December 31, 2013, (ii) such 38 
installation is for commercial or industrial purposes, (iii) the nameplate 39 
capacity of such source or facility does not exceed the load for the 40 
location where such generation or displacement is located, and (iv) such 41 
source or facility is not located in a municipality described in 42 
subparagraph (B) of this subdivision; 43 
(D) [For] Except as provided in subparagraph (E) of this subdivision, 44 
for assessment years commencing on and after October 1, 2014, any (i) 45 
Class I renewable energy source, as defined in section 16-1, (ii) 46 
hydropower facility described in subdivision (21) of subsection (a) of 47 
section 16-1, or (iii) solar thermal or geothermal renewable energy 48  Raised Bill No.  290 
 
 
 
LCO No. 1741   	3 of 4 
 
source, installed for generation or displacement of energy, provided (I) 49 
such installation occurs on or after January 1, 2014, (II) is for commercial 50 
or industrial purposes, (III) the nameplate capacity of such source or 51 
facility does not exceed the load for the location where such generation 52 
or displacement is located or the aggregated load of the beneficial 53 
accounts for any Class I renewable energy source participating in virtual 54 
net metering pursuant to section 16-244u, and (IV) in the case of clause 55 
(iii) of this subparagraph, such exemption shall apply only to the 56 
amount by which the assessed valuation of the real property equipped 57 
with such source exceeds the assessed valuation of such real property 58 
equipped with the conventional portion of the source; 59 
(E) For assessment years commencing on and after October 1, 2020, 60 
the exemption under subparagraph (D) of this subdivision shall not 61 
apply to any Class I renewable energy source, as defined in section 16-62 
1, participating in virtual net metering pursuant to section 16-244u; 63 
[(E)] (F) Any person claiming the exemption provided in this 64 
subdivision for any assessment year shall, on or before the first day of 65 
November in such assessment year, file with the assessor or board of 66 
assessors in the town in which such hydropower facility, Class I 67 
renewable energy source, solar thermal or geothermal renewable 68 
energy source or passive or active solar water or space heating system 69 
or geothermal energy resource is located, a written application claiming 70 
such exemption. Failure to file such application in the manner and form 71 
as provided by such assessor or board within the time limit prescribed 72 
shall constitute a waiver of the right to such exemption for such 73 
assessment year. Such application shall not be required for any 74 
assessment year following that for which the initial application is filed, 75 
provided if such hydropower facility, Class I renewable energy source, 76 
solar thermal or geothermal renewable energy source or passive or 77 
active solar water or space heating system or geothermal energy 78 
resource is altered in a manner which would require a building permit, 79 
such alteration shall be deemed a waiver of the right to such exemption 80 
until a new application, applicable with respect to such altered source, 81 
is filed and the right to such exemption is established as required 82  Raised Bill No.  290 
 
 
 
LCO No. 1741   	4 of 4 
 
initially; 83 
[(F)] (G) For assessment years commencing on and after October 1, 84 
2015, any municipality may, by vote of its legislative body or, in a 85 
municipality where the legislative body is a town meeting, by vote of 86 
the board of selectmen, abate up to one hundred per cent of the property 87 
taxes due for any tax year, for not longer than the term of the power 88 
purchase agreement, with respect to any Class I renewable energy 89 
source, as defined in section 16-1, that is the subject of such power 90 
purchase agreement approved by the Public Utilities Regulatory 91 
Authority pursuant to section 16a-3f; 92 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 from passage and 
applicable to assessment 
years commencing on and 
after October 1, 2020 
12-81(57) 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To eliminate a property tax exemption applicable to Class I renewable 
energy sources participating in virtual net metering. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except 
that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not 
underlined.]