Connecticut 2020 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00290 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33 LCO No. 1741 1 of 4
44
55 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 290
66 February Session, 2020
77 LCO No. 1741
88
99
1010 Referred to Committee on ENERGY AND TECHNOLOGY
1111
1212
1313 Introduced by:
1414 (ET)
1515
1616
1717
1818
1919 AN ACT CONCERNING TA XATION OF CERTAIN SOLAR POWER
2020 FACILITIES.
2121 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General
2222 Assembly convened:
2323
2424 Section 1. Subdivision (57) of section 12-81 of the 2020 supplement to 1
2525 the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu 2
2626 thereof (Effective from passage and applicable to assessment years commencing 3
2727 on and after October 1, 2020): 4
2828 (57) (A) (i) Any Class I renewable energy source, as defined in section 5
2929 16-1, or hydropower facility described in subdivision (21) of subsection 6
3030 (a) of section 16-1, installed for the generation of electricity for private 7
3131 residential use or on a farm, as defined in subsection (q) of section 1-1, 8
3232 provided such installation occurs on or after October 1, 2007, and further 9
3333 provided such installation is for a single family dwelling, a multifamily 10
3434 dwelling consisting of two to four units or a farm, (ii) any passive or 11
3535 active solar water or space heating system, or (iii) any geothermal 12
3636 energy resource. In the case of clause (ii) or (iii) of this subparagraph, 13
3737 such exemption shall apply only to the amount by which the assessed 14
3838 valuation of the real property equipped with such system or resource 15 Raised Bill No. 290
3939
4040
4141
4242 LCO No. 1741 2 of 4
4343
4444 exceeds the assessed valuation of such real property equipped with the 16
4545 conventional portion of the system or resource; 17
4646 (B) For assessment years commencing on and after October 1, 2013, 18
4747 any Class I renewable energy source, as defined in section 16-1, 19
4848 hydropower facility described in subdivision (21) of subsection (a) of 20
4949 section 16-1, or solar thermal or geothermal renewable energy source, 21
5050 installed for generation or displacement of energy, provided (i) such 22
5151 installation occurs on or after January 1, 2010, (ii) such installation is for 23
5252 commercial or industrial purposes, (iii) the nameplate capacity of such 24
5353 source or facility does not exceed the load for the location where such 25
5454 generation or displacement is located, and (iv) such source or facility is 26
5555 located in a distressed municipality, as defined in section 32-9p, with a 27
5656 population between one hundred twenty-five thousand and one 28
5757 hundred thirty-five thousand; 29
5858 (C) For assessment years commencing on and after October 1, 2013, 30
5959 any municipality may, upon approval by its legislative body or in any 31
6060 town in which the legislative body is a town meeting, by the board of 32
6161 selectmen, abate up to one hundred per cent of property tax for any 33
6262 Class I renewable energy source, as defined in section 16-1, hydropower 34
6363 facility described in subdivision (21) of subsection (a) of section 16-1, or 35
6464 solar thermal or geothermal renewable energy source, installed for 36
6565 generation or displacement of energy, provided (i) such installation 37
6666 occurs between January 1, 2010, and December 31, 2013, (ii) such 38
6767 installation is for commercial or industrial purposes, (iii) the nameplate 39
6868 capacity of such source or facility does not exceed the load for the 40
6969 location where such generation or displacement is located, and (iv) such 41
7070 source or facility is not located in a municipality described in 42
7171 subparagraph (B) of this subdivision; 43
7272 (D) [For] Except as provided in subparagraph (E) of this subdivision, 44
7373 for assessment years commencing on and after October 1, 2014, any (i) 45
7474 Class I renewable energy source, as defined in section 16-1, (ii) 46
7575 hydropower facility described in subdivision (21) of subsection (a) of 47
7676 section 16-1, or (iii) solar thermal or geothermal renewable energy 48 Raised Bill No. 290
7777
7878
7979
8080 LCO No. 1741 3 of 4
8181
8282 source, installed for generation or displacement of energy, provided (I) 49
8383 such installation occurs on or after January 1, 2014, (II) is for commercial 50
8484 or industrial purposes, (III) the nameplate capacity of such source or 51
8585 facility does not exceed the load for the location where such generation 52
8686 or displacement is located or the aggregated load of the beneficial 53
8787 accounts for any Class I renewable energy source participating in virtual 54
8888 net metering pursuant to section 16-244u, and (IV) in the case of clause 55
8989 (iii) of this subparagraph, such exemption shall apply only to the 56
9090 amount by which the assessed valuation of the real property equipped 57
9191 with such source exceeds the assessed valuation of such real property 58
9292 equipped with the conventional portion of the source; 59
9393 (E) For assessment years commencing on and after October 1, 2020, 60
9494 the exemption under subparagraph (D) of this subdivision shall not 61
9595 apply to any Class I renewable energy source, as defined in section 16-62
9696 1, participating in virtual net metering pursuant to section 16-244u; 63
9797 [(E)] (F) Any person claiming the exemption provided in this 64
9898 subdivision for any assessment year shall, on or before the first day of 65
9999 November in such assessment year, file with the assessor or board of 66
100100 assessors in the town in which such hydropower facility, Class I 67
101101 renewable energy source, solar thermal or geothermal renewable 68
102102 energy source or passive or active solar water or space heating system 69
103103 or geothermal energy resource is located, a written application claiming 70
104104 such exemption. Failure to file such application in the manner and form 71
105105 as provided by such assessor or board within the time limit prescribed 72
106106 shall constitute a waiver of the right to such exemption for such 73
107107 assessment year. Such application shall not be required for any 74
108108 assessment year following that for which the initial application is filed, 75
109109 provided if such hydropower facility, Class I renewable energy source, 76
110110 solar thermal or geothermal renewable energy source or passive or 77
111111 active solar water or space heating system or geothermal energy 78
112112 resource is altered in a manner which would require a building permit, 79
113113 such alteration shall be deemed a waiver of the right to such exemption 80
114114 until a new application, applicable with respect to such altered source, 81
115115 is filed and the right to such exemption is established as required 82 Raised Bill No. 290
116116
117117
118118
119119 LCO No. 1741 4 of 4
120120
121121 initially; 83
122122 [(F)] (G) For assessment years commencing on and after October 1, 84
123123 2015, any municipality may, by vote of its legislative body or, in a 85
124124 municipality where the legislative body is a town meeting, by vote of 86
125125 the board of selectmen, abate up to one hundred per cent of the property 87
126126 taxes due for any tax year, for not longer than the term of the power 88
127127 purchase agreement, with respect to any Class I renewable energy 89
128128 source, as defined in section 16-1, that is the subject of such power 90
129129 purchase agreement approved by the Public Utilities Regulatory 91
130130 Authority pursuant to section 16a-3f; 92
131131 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following
132132 sections:
133133
134134 Section 1 from passage and
135135 applicable to assessment
136136 years commencing on and
137137 after October 1, 2020
138138 12-81(57)
139139
140140 Statement of Purpose:
141141 To eliminate a property tax exemption applicable to Class I renewable
142142 energy sources participating in virtual net metering.
143143 [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except
144144 that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not
145145 underlined.]
146146