Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05011 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note April 15, 2021
Bill January 7, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis May 19, 2021
Bill May 3, 2021
Bill April 15, 2021
Analysis April 15, 2021
Bill March 3, 2021