House | 04/08/2021 | File Number 329 | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | House Calendar Number 245 | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | ||
House | 03/19/2021 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | Public Hearing 02/18 | ||
House | 02/09/2021 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |