House | 06/04/2021 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/02/2021 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/02/2021 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/01/2021 | Public Act 21-27 | ||
House | 05/26/2021 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/26/2021 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 412 | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | File Number 17 | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | House Calendar Number 47 | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/24/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/18/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/04/2021 | Public Hearing 02/09 | ||
House | 02/03/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 01/21/2021 | Vote to Draft |