House | 05/26/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 495 | ||
House | 05/26/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/24/2021 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | File Number 8 | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | House Calendar Number 45 | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/26/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/03/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/17/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/16/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 01/25/2021 | Public Hearing 01/28 | ||
House | 01/22/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |