House | 04/26/2021 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | File Number 296 | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | House Calendar Number 228 | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/26/2021 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
House | 02/24/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | ||
House | 02/23/2021 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | Vote to Draft |