House | 05/04/2021 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | File Number 145 | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | House Calendar Number 134 | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/05/2021 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
House | 02/09/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | ||
House | 02/08/2021 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/04/2021 | Vote to Draft |