Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05614 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/29/2021

                     
 
LCO 4506  \\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-05614-R02-
HB.docx  
1 of 4 
  
General Assembly  Corrected Copy 
Committee Bill No.  5614  
January Session, 2021  
LCO No. 4506 
 
 
Referred to Committee on COMMERCE  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(CE)  
 
 
 
AN ACT ESTABLISHING A COMMISSION ON THE DISPARATE 
IMPACT OF COVID-19.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective from passage) (a) As used in this section, 1 
"COVID-19" means the respiratory disease designated by the World 2 
Health Organization on February 11, 2020, as coronavirus 2019, and any 3 
related mutation thereof recognized by the World Health Organization 4 
as a communicable respiratory disease. 5 
(b) There is established a Commission on the Disparate Impact of 6 
COVID-19, which shall be part of the Legislative Department. 7 
(c) The commission, established in subsection (b) of this section, shall 8 
consist of the following members: 9 
(1) Four appointed by the speaker of the House of Representatives 10 
who have expertise in evaluating disparities in education, housing and 11 
human services; 12  Committee Bill No. 5614 
 
 
LCO 4506  {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-05614-
R02-HB.docx }   
2 of 4 
 
(2) Four appointed by the president pro tempore of the Senate who 13 
have expertise in evaluating the impact of COVID-19 on essential 14 
workers; 15 
(3) Three appointed by the majority leader of the House of 16 
Representatives, two of whom have expertise in public health and 17 
infectious diseases and one of whom shall be a teacher; 18 
(4) Three appointed by the majority leader of the Senate, two of 19 
whom have expertise in small business and one of whom shall be a 20 
housing advocate; 21 
(5) Three appointed by the minority leader of the House of 22 
Representatives, two of whom have expertise in nursing homes and one 23 
of whom shall be a representative of higher education; 24 
(6) Three appointed by the minority leader of the Senate, two of 25 
whom have expertise in health care delivery and one of whom has 26 
expertise in the hospitality industry; 27 
(7) Four appointed by the Governor, who have expertise in 28 
evaluating racial, economic and health disparities; 29 
(8) A representative of the Black and Puerto Rican Caucus of the 30 
General Assembly, who shall be appointed by the chairperson of said 31 
caucus; and 32 
(9) The executive director of the Commission on Women, Children, 33 
Seniors, Equity and Opportunity, or the executive director's designee, 34 
who shall be a nonvoting ex-officio member. 35 
(d) Any member of the commission appointed under subsection (c) 36 
of this section may be a member of the General Assembly. 37 
(e) All initial appointments to the commission shall be made not later 38 
than September 1, 2021, and shall terminate on August 31, 2022, 39 
regardless of when the initial appointment was made. Any member of 40  Committee Bill No. 5614 
 
 
LCO 4506  {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-05614-
R02-HB.docx }   
3 of 4 
 
the commission may serve more than one term. 41 
(f) The speaker of the House of Representatives and the president pro 42 
tempore of the Senate shall select the chairperson of the commission 43 
from among the members of the commission. Such chairperson shall 44 
schedule the first meeting of the commission, which shall be held not 45 
later than September 1, 2021. 46 
(g) The administrative staff of the Commission on Women, Children, 47 
Seniors, Equity and Opportunity shall serve as administrative staff of 48 
the commission. 49 
(h) Appointed members of the commission shall serve for two-year 50 
terms, which shall commence on the date of appointment, except as 51 
provided in subsection (e) of this section. Members shall continue to 52 
serve until their successors are appointed. 53 
(i) Any vacancy shall be filled by the appointing authority. Any 54 
vacancy occurring other than by expiration of term shall be filled for the 55 
balance of the unexpired term. 56 
(j) A majority of the commission shall constitute a quorum for the 57 
transaction of any business. 58 
(k) The members of the commission shall serve without 59 
compensation, but shall, within available funds, be reimbursed for 60 
expenses necessarily incurred in the performance of their duties. 61 
(l) The commission shall have the following powers and duties: (1) 62 
To analyze any disparate impact of the COVID-19 pandemic on 63 
different racial, ethnic and socioeconomic groups in the state; (2) to 64 
identify the causes for such disparate impact; (3) to assess whether such 65 
disparate impact was worsened or corrected by state responses to the 66 
COVID-19 pandemic; (4) to appoint and convene at least two working 67 
groups to analyze the impact of the COVID-19 pandemic, one to focus 68 
on the impact on education, housing and human services needs and 69 
another to focus on the impact on labor, commerce and public health 70  Committee Bill No. 5614 
 
 
LCO 4506  {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-05614-
R02-HB.docx }   
4 of 4 
 
needs; (5) to hold one or more public hearings as necessary to carry out 71 
the purposes of this section; (6) to obtain from any executive 72 
department, board, commission or other agency of the state such 73 
assistance and data as necessary and available to carry out the purposes 74 
of this section; (7) to accept any gift, donation or bequest for the purpose 75 
of performing the duties described in this section; (8) to establish bylaws 76 
to govern its procedures; and (9) to perform such other acts as may be 77 
necessary and appropriate to carry out the duties described in this 78 
subsection. 79 
(m) The commission shall meet as often as deemed necessary by the 80 
chairperson. 81 
(n) Not later than January 1, 2022, and annually thereafter, the 82 
commission shall submit a report, in accordance with the provisions of 83 
section 11-4a of the general statutes, to the Governor, the speaker of the 84 
House of Representatives, the president pro tempore of the Senate, the 85 
majority leader of the House of Representatives, the majority leader of 86 
the Senate, the minority leader of the House of Representatives, the 87 
minority leader of the Senate and the chairperson of the Black and 88 
Puerto Rican Caucus of the General Assembly on (1) the results of the 89 
commission's analysis pursuant to subsection (l) of this section, and (2) 90 
recommendations for policy changes and amendments to the general 91 
statutes necessary to address the causes for any disparate impact of the 92 
COVID-19 pandemic and to improve outcomes during any future 93 
pandemic. 94 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 from passage New section 
 
CE Joint Favorable