Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05614 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 28, 2021
Fiscal Note April 27, 2021
Fiscal Note April 26, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021
Bill January 26, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 28, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis April 28, 2021
Analysis April 27, 2021
Bill March 29, 2021
Analysis March 29, 2021
Bill February 23, 2021