House | 05/26/2021 | File Number 723 | ||
House | 05/26/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 491 | ||
House | 05/26/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/24/2021 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/24/2021 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9093 | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | File Number 495 | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | House Calendar Number 362 | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Public Hearing 03/19 | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | Vote to Draft |