House | 05/14/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 442 | ||
House | 05/14/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/12/2021 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | File Number 411 | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | House Calendar Number 312 | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |