LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2021 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB05731
Action History
CT
Connecticut House Bill HB05731
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2021 Regular Session
Connecticut House Bill HB05731
Action History
House
03/09/2021
Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
House
03/08/2021
Drafted by Committee
House
02/16/2021
Vote to Draft
House
02/05/2021
Public Hearing 02/11
House
02/04/2021
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing