Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05743 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/27/2021

                             
 
LCO No. 1370   	1 of 2 
 
General Assembly  Proposed Bill No. 5743  
January Session, 2021  
LCO No. 1370 
 
 
Referred to Committee on APPROPRIATIONS  
 
 
Introduced by:  
REP. TURCO, 27th Dist.  
 
 
 
AN ACT INCREASING FUNDING FOR NONPROFIT PROVIDERS OF 
HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
That a total of sixty-seven million dollars be appropriated to the 1 
Department of Social Services, the Department of Developmental 2 
Services and the Department of Mental Health and Addiction Services, 3 
from the General Fund, for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022, and a 4 
total of fifty-one million dollars be appropriated to said departments, 5 
from the General Fund, for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022, and that 6 
the general statutes be amended to require appropriations to said 7 
departments from the General Fund in the amount of fifty-four million 8 
dollars for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2024, thirty-four million 9 
dollars for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025, and thirty-five million 10 
dollars for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2026, with all said 11 
appropriations being for the purpose of increasing funding for 12 
nonprofit providers of health and human services. 13  Proposed Bill No.  5743 
 
 
LCO No. 1370   	2 of 2 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To increase funding for certain health and human services nonprofit 
providers over the next five fiscal years and leverage significant federal 
matching funds over that period.