Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05744 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/27/2021

                             
 
LCO No. 1427   	1 of 1 
 
General Assembly  Proposed Bill No. 5744  
January Session, 2021  
LCO No. 1427 
 
 
Referred to Committee on APPROPRIATIONS  
 
 
Introduced by:  
REP. DILLON, 92nd Dist. 
 
 
 
AN ACT INCREASING FUNDING FOR COMMUNITY NONPROFIT 
PROVIDERS OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
That the general statutes be amended to require that funding for 1 
certain nonprofit providers of health and human services be increased 2 
by seven per cent for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022, five per cent 3 
for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023, five per cent for the fiscal year 4 
ending June 30, 2024, three per cent for the fiscal year ending June 30, 5 
2025, and three per cent for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2026.  6 
Statement of Purpose:   
To provide financial support to nonprofit providers that face complex 
needs and new costs, including costs related to equipment and 
caseloads.