House | 05/06/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 385 | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | File Number 149 | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | House Calendar Number 138 | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/12/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/26/2021 | Public Hearing 03/02 | ||
House | 02/24/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | ||
House | 02/23/2021 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/04/2021 | Vote to Draft |