Senate | 06/09/2021 | Bill Placed on Senate Agenda, Senate Agenda Never Adopted | ||
Senate | 06/09/2021 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 06/09/2021 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | File Number 298 | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | House Calendar Number 230 | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Public Hearing 03/02 | ||
House | 02/24/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
House | 02/23/2021 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2021 | Vote to Draft |