House | 04/15/2021 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | No New File by Committee on Environment | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Referred by House to Committee on Environment | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | File Number 102 | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | House Calendar Number 112 | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/17/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/19/2021 | Public Hearing 02/25 | ||
House | 01/28/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |