House
|
06/07/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2021
|
Public Act 21-21
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
File Number 630
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 388
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 7997
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7098
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2021
|
File Number 49
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2021
|
House Calendar Number 72
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2021
|
Public Hearing 02/03
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|