House
|
06/10/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2021
|
Public Act 21-29
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 9496
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 9501
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
File Number 716
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 477
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 9006
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8977
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
File Number 541
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
House Calendar Number 385
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/15
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|