House | 04/19/2021 | File Number 497 | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | House Calendar Number 364 | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Public Hearing 03/26 | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 03/17/2021 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | Vote to Draft |