House | 03/25/2021 | File Number 133 | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | House Calendar Number 127 | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/19/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | Public Hearing 02/18 | ||
House | 02/09/2021 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |