Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06229 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/29/2021

                     
 
LCO    \\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06229-R02-
HB.docx  
1 of 4 
  
General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 6229  
January Session, 2021 
 
 
 
 
 
AN ACT ADDRESSING TH E NEEDS OF FOOD-INSECURE STUDENTS 
AT PUBLIC INSTITUTIONS OF HIGHER EDUCATION.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2021) (a) As used in this section, 1 
"food insecurity" or "food insecure" means the lack of financial resources 2 
needed to consistently access enough food for an active and healthy life. 3 
(b) Not later than March 1, 2022, and biennially thereafter, each public 4 
institution of higher education in the state shall administer a survey to 5 
each student enrolled at such institution for the purpose of collecting 6 
data on the number of students who are food insecure and the causes of 7 
and reasons for such food insecurity. Such survey shall include, but 8 
need not be limited to, questions regarding a student's (1) demographic 9 
background, including age, race, ethnicity, gender identity, marital 10 
status, income, education and employment; (2) specific barriers to food 11 
access; and (3) awareness or use of community or institutional resources 12 
to address food insecurity and any barriers to accessing such resources. 13 
(c) Not later than October 1, 2022, and biennially thereafter, each 14 
public institution of higher education shall evaluate any services and 15 
programs offered by such institution to address the needs of food-16 
insecure students. Based on the results of the survey administered 17 
pursuant to subsection (b) of this section, each institution shall amend 18  Substitute Bill No. 6229 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06229-
R02-HB.docx }   
2 of 4 
 
any existing or establish new services and programs to address the 19 
needs of food-insecure students. Such services or programs may 20 
include, but not be limited to, (1) assistance and support for students to 21 
enroll in the supplemental nutrition assistance program pursuant to the 22 
federal Food and Nutrition Act of 2008 or any other state or federal 23 
program for nutrition assistance or financial aid, including programs for 24 
families, if applicable to the student; (2) providing low-cost food or meal 25 
plan options on campus; (3) allowing students additional meals through 26 
extra card swipes on meal plans; (4) providing financial assistance or 27 
other financial student aid; (5) establishing or expanding a food pantry 28 
on campus; or (6) initiating a fruit and vegetable incentive program, or 29 
making such program available to students through agreement with a 30 
community nonprofit organization or governmental agency that 31 
provides such program. When amending or establishing any services or 32 
programs pursuant to this subsection, each institution shall have the 33 
goal of providing such services and programs to not less than ten per 34 
cent of the number of students identified as being food insecure in the 35 
survey administered pursuant to subsection (b) of this section. 36 
(d) Not later than January 1, 2023, and biennially thereafter, each 37 
public institution of higher education in the state shall submit a report, 38 
in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, 39 
to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having 40 
cognizance of matters relating to higher education, regarding any food 41 
insecurities among the students at such institution, including, but not 42 
limited to, (1) results from the survey administered pursuant to 43 
subsection (b) of this section, (2) services and programs to address the 44 
needs of food insecure students, including any amendments made to 45 
such services or programs pursuant to subsection (c) of this section, and 46 
(3) the number of students who utilized such services and programs 47 
during the preceding two years. 48 
Sec. 2. Section 17b-105f of the general statutes is amended by adding 49 
subsections (e) and (f) as follows (Effective July 1, 2021): 50 
(NEW) (e) (1) Not later than January 1, 2022, and annually thereafter, 51  Substitute Bill No. 6229 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06229-
R02-HB.docx }   
3 of 4 
 
the Board of Regents for Higher Education and the Board of Trustees of 52 
The University of Connecticut shall consult with the Department of 53 
Social Services for the purpose of identifying any educational program 54 
offered at an institution of higher education governed by said boards 55 
that qualifies as an employment and training program which increases 56 
a student's employability and complies with the requirements for an 57 
exemption, as specified in 7 CFR 273.5(b)(11), as amended from time to 58 
time, from the supplemental nutrition assistance program eligibility 59 
rule in 7 CFR 273.5(a), as amended from time to time. In identifying such 60 
educational programs, the department and said boards shall seek to 61 
maximize the number and types of employment and training programs 62 
offered at the institution of higher education governed by said boards. 63 
(2) Any independent institution of higher education in the state may, 64 
in such institution's discretion, consult with the Department of Social 65 
Services for the purposes set forth in subdivision (1) of this subsection. 66 
(NEW) (f) Not later than July 1, 2022, the Department of Social 67 
Services, the Board of Regents for Higher Education and the Board of 68 
Trustees of The University of Connecticut shall each post, and regularly 69 
update, on their Internet web site, the list of educational programs 70 
offered at each institution of higher education governed by said boards 71 
that has been qualified as an employment and training program 72 
pursuant to subdivision (1) of subsection (e) of this section. 73 
Sec. 3. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2021) For the purpose of determining 74 
eligibility for the supplemental nutrition assistance program pursuant 75 
to the federal Food and Nutrition Act of 2008, as amended from time to 76 
time, the Department of Social Services shall consider any student 77 
enrolled in an institution of higher education in the state to be 78 
participating in a state or federally financed work-study program if such 79 
student receives approval of work-study as part of a financial aid 80 
package to attend such institution of higher education, regardless of 81 
whether such student has received his or her work-study program 82 
assignment. 83  Substitute Bill No. 6229 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06229-
R02-HB.docx }   
4 of 4 
 
Sec. 4. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2021) Each public institution of higher 84 
education shall notify any student identified by the financial aid office 85 
of such public institution of higher education as potentially eligible for 86 
the supplemental nutrition assistance program pursuant to the federal 87 
Food and Nutrition Act of 2008, as amended from time to time, 88 
regarding (1) the qualification requirements for such program, (2) the 89 
application procedure for such program, and (3) where to obtain 90 
assistance in completing an application for such program.91 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2021 New section 
Sec. 2 July 1, 2021 17b-105f 
Sec. 3 July 1, 2021 New section 
Sec. 4 July 1, 2021 New section 
 
HED Joint Favorable Subst.