Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06235 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/08/2021

                             
 
LCO    \\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06235-R02-
HB.docx  
1 of 4 
  
General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 6235  
January Session, 2021 
 
 
 
 
 
AN ACT ESTABLISHING THE "LEARN HERE, HEAL HERE" 
PROGRAM.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2021) (a) The Commissioner of 1 
Economic and Community Development, in consultation with the 2 
Commissioner of Revenue Services, shall establish the Learn Here, Heal 3 
Here program. Such program may provide an incentive for persons 4 
licensed to practice psychiatry pursuant to the provisions of chapter 370 5 
of the general statutes to buy a first home in the state. Persons who (1) 6 
graduate on or after January 1, 2022, from a medical school located in 7 
the United States or Canada accredited by the Liaison Committee on 8 
Medical Education, (2) are licensed to practice psychiatry pursuant to 9 
the provisions of chapter 370 of the general statutes, and (3) accept 10 
patients who receive health care coverage through any medical 11 
insurance plan, including, but not limited to, the HUSKY Health 12 
program, may apply to the Commissioner of Economic and Community 13 
Development, in the form and manner prescribed by the commissioner, 14 
to have their income tax liability, up to a maximum of two thousand five 15 
hundred dollars annually, segregated into the Learn Here, Heal Here 16 
homebuyers account established pursuant to section 3 of this act, 17 
provided, in any calendar year, not more than (A) one million dollars 18 
from all program participants may be so segregated, and (B) forty 19  Substitute Bill No. 6235 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06235-
R02-HB.docx }   
2 of 4 
 
persons may be accepted as new program participants. After a period 20 
not exceeding ten years after graduation from medical school, any 21 
amounts so segregated may be withdrawn by a participant for the 22 
purchase of a first home in the state. The Commissioner of Economic 23 
and Community Development  shall make payments in accordance with 24 
this section from said account to the participants. 25 
(b) (1) After a period not exceeding ten years after the date of 26 
graduation from medical school, a participant in the program 27 
established pursuant to subsection (a) of this section may apply to the 28 
Commissioner of Economic and Community Development for a 29 
payment to be issued, on behalf of such participant, and used as the 30 
down payment on a house, which shall be the first house such 31 
participant has bought, either singly or with any other person. Such 32 
payment may be in an amount equal to the amount of segregated funds 33 
deposited on behalf of such participant. If the payment is less than such 34 
amount, any excess amount shall be deposited in the General Fund. 35 
(2) If a participant in the program established pursuant to subsection 36 
(a) of this section moves out of the state at any time up to one year after 37 
the date on which the Commissioner of Economic and Community 38 
Development issued the payment to the participant, such participant 39 
shall repay one hundred per cent of the amount paid on behalf of such 40 
participant. If a participant moves out of the state at any time up to two 41 
years after such payment, such participant shall repay eighty per cent of 42 
the amount paid on behalf of such participant. If a participant moves 43 
out of the state at any time up to three years after such payment, such 44 
participant shall repay sixty per cent of the amount paid on behalf of 45 
such participant. If a participant moves out of the state at any time up 46 
to four years after such payment, such participant shall repay forty per 47 
cent of the amount paid on behalf of such participant. If a participant 48 
moves out of the state at any time up to five years after such payment, 49 
such participant shall repay twenty per cent of the amount paid on 50 
behalf of such participant. After five years, there is no repayment 51 
obligation. Any amounts repaid under this subdivision shall be 52  Substitute Bill No. 6235 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06235-
R02-HB.docx }   
3 of 4 
 
deposited in the General Fund. The commissioner shall file a lien against 53 
the title of the property purchased by the participant in the amount of 54 
the payment issued by the commissioner on the date of such purchase 55 
to secure the repayment of the amounts required pursuant to this 56 
subdivision. The lien filed by the commissioner shall take precedence 57 
over any subsequent transfer or encumbrances recorded against the title 58 
of the property, including any mortgage lien filed contemporaneously 59 
with the commissioner's lien, and shall expire after a period of not less 60 
than five years from the participant's purchase of the property. 61 
(c) On or before December 1, 2021, the Commissioner of Economic 62 
and Community Development shall develop, within available 63 
appropriations, a public education program to educate recent graduates 64 
of any medical school located in the United States or Canada accredited 65 
by the Liaison Committee on Medical Education about the program 66 
established under subdivision (2) of subsection (a) of this section for 67 
first-time home buyers. The department shall begin to implement such 68 
education program not later than January 1, 2022. 69 
Sec. 2. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2021) As part of the Learn Here, Heal 70 
Here program established pursuant to section 1 of this act, for taxable 71 
years commencing on or after January 1, 2022, the Commissioner of 72 
Revenue Services shall segregate the income taxes paid by a participant 73 
in said program during a period not exceeding ten taxable years 74 
following the year of such participant's graduation from medical school. 75 
Upon the request of such participant, the commissioner shall segregate 76 
an annual amount of such tax liability, up to a maximum of two 77 
thousand five hundred dollars per year. The total amount segregated 78 
for all program participants shall not exceed one million dollars for each 79 
program in any calendar year. The commissioner shall deposit such 80 
segregated amounts into the Learn Here, Heal Here homebuyers 81 
account established pursuant to section 3 of this act.  82 
Sec. 3. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2021) There is established a Learn Here, 83 
Heal Here homebuyers account which shall be a separate, nonlapsing 84 
account within the General Fund. Funds segregated by the 85  Substitute Bill No. 6235 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06235-
R02-HB.docx }   
4 of 4 
 
Commissioner of Revenue Services, pursuant to section 2 of this act, 86 
shall be deposited in the account. An amount equal to the amount 87 
deposited in the account shall be available to the Commissioner of 88 
Economic and Community Development for payments to participants 89 
in the program established pursuant to section 1 of this act. The State 90 
Treasurer shall invest the proceeds of the account, and investment 91 
earnings, after paying any costs incurred by the State Treasurer in 92 
administering the account, shall be credited to the General Fund. On or 93 
before September 1, 2022, and annually thereafter, the State Treasurer 94 
shall notify the Commissioner of Economic and Community 95 
Development of the total amount deposited in the account. Any funds 96 
segregated on behalf of a participant that are not used for the purchase 97 
of a first home shall be transferred to the General Fund. 98 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2021 New section 
Sec. 2 July 1, 2021 New section 
Sec. 3 July 1, 2021 New section 
 
Statement of Legislative Commissioners:   
In Section 1(b)(1), "jointly" was changed to "with any other person" for 
accuracy and in Section 1(b)(2), "ceases to live" was changed to "moves 
out of" and "paid out" was changed to "paid on behalf of such 
participant" for clarity and accuracy. 
 
HED Joint Favorable Subst.