LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2021 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB06240
Action History
CT
Connecticut House Bill HB06240
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2021 Regular Session
Connecticut House Bill HB06240
Action History
House
02/26/2021
Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
House
02/25/2021
Drafted by Committee
House
02/23/2021
Vote to Draft
House
02/16/2021
Public Hearing 02/18
House
02/09/2021
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing