House | 04/21/2021 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | File Number 10 | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | House Calendar Number 44 | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 02/26/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/03/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Public Hearing 02/09 | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |