House | 03/09/2021 | File Number 24 | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | House Calendar Number 54 | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/24/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/18/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/04/2021 | Public Hearing 02/09 | ||
House | 02/03/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |