Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06387 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 10, 2021
Fiscal Note May 8, 2021
Fiscal Note May 6, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021
Bill February 3, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis August 6, 2021
Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis May 8, 2021
Bill March 29, 2021
Analysis March 29, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 24, 2021