House | 03/18/2021 | File Number 85 | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | House Calendar Number 96 | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/12/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/17/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/05/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/05/2021 | Public Hearing 02/11 | ||
House | 02/04/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |